CA AB1236 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 502 to, and to repeal Sections 2717, 2852.5, 3518.1, 3770.1, and 4506 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Healing arts: licensees: data collection.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Ting. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Action rescinded and record expunged whereby a roll call vote was taken. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2717 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2852.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3518.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3770.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4506 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 502 | New Code | See Bill Text |