CA AB1235 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 341, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 341, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1502, 1502.35, 1507.6, 1522.44, 1530.8, 1536, 1538.7, 1538.8, 1538.9, 1548, and 1562 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 319, 361.2, 450, 727, and 11400 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to care facilities.
Title
Youth homelessness prevention centers.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1235 Chu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1235 Chu et al. By Caballero (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1235 Chu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1235 Chu et al. By Caballero (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1235 Chu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 341, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2898.). |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2282.). |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1478.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1502.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1507.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1522.44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1530.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1536 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1538.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1538.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1538.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1548 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1562 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 319 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 361.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 727 | Amended Code | Citation Text |