CA AB123 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2015 by amending Items 0250-101-0932, 0250-102-0932, 0250-111-0001, 0250-114-0001, 0530-001-0001, 0540-001-0001, 0540-001-0140, 0540-001-6076, 0552-001-0001, 0690-101-0001, 2240-104-0001, 3540-001-0001, 3600-001-0001, 3640-311-0001, 3790-001-0392, 3790-301-0392, 3860-001-6052, 3940-001-0890, 4170-101-0001, 4260-001-0001, 4260-101-0001, 4260-101-0890, 4260-115-0001, 4260-116-0001, 4265-001-0001, 4265-111-0001, 4300-101-0001, 4440-011-0001, 5160-001-0001, 5180-001-0001, 5180-101-0001, 5180-101-0890 5180-111-0001, 5180-141-0001, 5180-141-0890, 5180-151-0001, 5180-151-0890, 5180-153-0001, 5225-001-0001, 5225-001-3259, 5227-101-0214, 5227-101-3259, 5227-109-0001, 5227-110-0001, 6100-001-0001, 6100-113-0001, 6100-113-0890, 6100-119-0001, 6100-161-0001, 6100-194-0001, 6100-194-0890, 6100-195-0890, 6100-196-0001, 6120-211-0001, 6120-213-0001, 6440-001-0001, 6440-004-0001, 6610-001-0001, 6870-101-0001, 6870-107-0001, 6980-101-0001, 7100-001-0869, 7100-001-3259, 7320-001-0001, 7350-001-3152, 8570-001-0001, and 8820-001-0001 of, by adding Items 0500-001-9750, 0540-490, 0650-101-0001, 0690-101-3034, 3110-001-0286, 3640-401, 3640-402, 3640-494, 3790-001-0942, 3900-001-0462, 4260-118-0313, and 5227-102-0001 to, and by repealing Items 0521-101-3228, 0650-001-9750, 2660-101-3228, 2660-108-3228, 2660-301-3228, 2665-001-3228, 3110-001-0001, 3720-001-8029, 3760-001-8029, 3760-101-8029, 3820-001-8029, 3900-101-3228, 3970-101-3228, 5227-108-0001, 6100-111-0001, 6100-249-0001, 6980-401, and 7350-001-0001 of, Section 2.00 of, and by amending Sections 3.61, 4.11, 6.10, 12.32, 35.50, and 39.00 of, that act, relating to the State Budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2015.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 123 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateDied on Senate inactive file.
2015-09-11SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
2015-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 18). Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 1486.) Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-16SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2015-03-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2015-03-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 645.)
2015-03-19AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-01-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2015-01-12AssemblyRead first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
2015-01-09AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback