CA AB1226 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6830.1 of the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to river port districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

River port districts: Sacramento-Yolo Port District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 1226 MCCARTY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2017-04-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5).
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Harbors and Navigation Code6830.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Harbors and Navigation Code6894.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback