CA AB1221 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 452, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 452, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1791 and 1794.4 of the Civil Code, relating to consumer warranties.
Title
Consumer warranties: service contracts: cancellation: disclosures.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1221 Flora Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1221 Flora By Jones (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1221 Flora Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1221 Flora By Jones (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1221 Flora Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 452, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2997.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2494.). |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 13). |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1656.) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1791 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1794.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |