CA AB1221 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11166.4 to the Penal Code, relating to child abuse.
Title
Children’s advocacy centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Assembly - AB 1221 Cooley Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1221 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1221 Cooley Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1221 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1221 Cooley Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-12 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-08-12 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-07-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2564.). |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1881.). |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUMAN S. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1468.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUM. S. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11166.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |