CA AB1221 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 847, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 25680) to Chapter 16 of Division 9 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control: Responsible Beverage Service Training Program Act of 2017.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1221 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1221 Gonzalez Fletcher By Pan (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1221 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 847, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-19AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 3143.).
2017-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 2576.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-17SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (July 11).
2017-07-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 1918.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27).
2017-04-19AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code25663Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25680New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback