CA AB1219 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1714.25 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 58502 of, and to repeal Section 58506 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, and to amend Sections 114432, 114433, and 114434 of, and to add Section 114435 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to food donations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food donations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1219 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-18SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11).
2017-06-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1377.)
2017-05-01AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1305.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-03AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-03-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 28).
2017-03-27AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback