CA AB1214 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 991, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 712 of, and to repeal and add Section 709 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile proceedings: competency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1214 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 21 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1214 Mark Stone By Mitchell (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1214 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 991, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 21. Page 6904.).
2018-08-28AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 28).
2018-08-28AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6705.)
2018-08-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 5760.).
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-06-11SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-24SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-05-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-14SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-10SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-05-08SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1428.)
2017-05-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 2).
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure263.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1942.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code709New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code712Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback