CA AB1212 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-14 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-14 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.104 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Asm. James Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-14 - Assembly - AB 1212 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 3307.) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 3242.) |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12012.104 | New Code | See Bill Text |