CA AB1207 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 26001 and 26120 of, and to add Sections 26133 and 26157 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: labeling and advertising.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1207 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2023-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2023-05-18AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2023-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
2023-05-03AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2023-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-19AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2023-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2023-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2023-03-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2023-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2023-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26001Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26120Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26133New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code26157New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback