CA AB1201 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1367.36 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Sections 10123.56 and 12693.56 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Immunizations for children: reimbursement of physicians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2009-05-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-29 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-27 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 21). | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |