CA AB1200 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, add, and repeal Sections 82002 and 82039 of, and to add Section 86207 to, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: lobbying: procurement contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1200 GORDON Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1200 Gordon By Allen Urgency Claus (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1200 Gordon By Allen Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1200 Gordon By Allen (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1200 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1200 Gordon By Allen Urgency Claus (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1200 Gordon By Allen Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1200 Gordon By Allen (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1200 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-05-13 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4621.). |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 3171.). |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 2600.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Allen. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2600.) |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1852.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 82002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 82039 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 86205.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |