CA AB1200 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7200, 7204, 7210, 7403, 7408, 7444, 7655, 7680, 8145, and 15401 of, to add Sections 7201.1 and 7201.2 to, and to repeal Sections 7681, 7782, and 7837 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Elections: central committees.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Asm. Roger Dickinson [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] |
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Assembly - AB 1200 MA Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1200 Ma Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1200 MA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1200 Ma Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1200 MA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-03-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-03-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:10 p.m. | |
2012-03-05 | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 5). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3919.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3920.). | |
2012-03-01 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2012-03-01 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 1.). | |
2012-02-28 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-02-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (February 21). | |
2012-02-16 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2012-02-07 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2011-06-23 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1781.) | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-05 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |
2011-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-21 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |