CA AB120 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 22, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 22, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2017 by amending Items 4260-101-0001 and 4260-101-0890 of, and to add Item 4260-101-3305 to, Section 2.00 of that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2017.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - AB 120 TING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB120 Ting By Mitchell (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 120 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB120 Ting By Mitchell (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 120 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 22, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6:50 p.m. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 8. Page 2214.). |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 2213.) |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1557.). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (June 13). |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1485.) |
2017-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1603.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1511.) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |