CA AB1194 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 795, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 795, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9401 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: local bond measures: tax rate statement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1194 DABABNEH Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1194 Dababneh et al. By McGuire (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1194 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1194 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading Motion to Postpone to a Time Cer By KILEY Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1194 Dababneh et al. By McGuire (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1194 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1194 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading Motion to Postpone to a Time Cer By KILEY Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 795, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 3114.). |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 2496.). |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 2039.) |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 1990.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1855.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1851.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 10). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 13119 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |