CA AB1191 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 97.68 and 97.70 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government finance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government finance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Assembly - AB 1191 HUBER Third Reading Urgency (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-16 In committee: Held under submission.
2012-06-25 In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2012-06-13 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-02-16 Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2012-01-26 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2012-01-26 Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3605.).
2012-01-24 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-01-23 Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-01-19 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 19).
2012-01-12 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-01-04 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2011-03-21 Referred to Com. on TRANS.
2011-02-20 From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2011-02-18 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1191&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_bill_20110218_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_bill_20120104_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_bill_20120123_amended_asm_v97.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_vote_20120111_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_vote_20120119_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_vote_20120126_1046AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_vote_20120613_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1151-1200/ab_1191_vote_20120625_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback