CA AB1186 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 189, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 189, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21200.1, 21200.6, 21200.8, 21201, and 21201.2 of the Financial Code, relating to pawnbrokers.
Title
Pawnbrokers: fees and charges.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] |
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Sen. Mike Morrell [R] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1186 Medina et al. By Bradford (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - AB 1186 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - AB 1186 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 189, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2136.). |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1076.) |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 1). |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 21200.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 21200.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 21200.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 21201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 21201.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |