CA AB1182 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 26 @ 9:00 am Assembly Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Part 15 (commencing with Section 53580) of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing: Teacher Housing Assistance Pilot Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-03AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 26).
2017-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-04-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-30AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and ED.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code46300.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code53580Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback