CA AB1182 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-04 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-04 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11155, 11155.1, and 11257 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalWORKs.
Title
CalWORKs eligibility: asset limits: vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Assembly - AB 1182 Roger Hernandez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1182 Roger Hernández By Liu (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1182 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1182 Roger Hernández By Liu (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1182 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-04 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2011-09-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-20 | Enrolled measure version corrected. | |
2011-09-08 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 3123.). | |
2011-09-06 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2307.). | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-27 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-15 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2011-05-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 1346.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11155.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11257 | Amended Code | Citation Text |