CA AB1162 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1368.7, 1371, and 1371.35 of, and to add Section 1371.15 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 10112.95, 10123.13, and 10123.147 of, and to add Section 10123.146 to, the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: claims payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 20). |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1368.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1371 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1371.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1371.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.146 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.147 | Amended Code | Citation Text |