CA AB1160 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1788.91, 1788.92, and 1788.93 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 66022 of, and to add Article 4.3 (commencing with Section 66035) to Chapter 2 of Part 40 of Division 5 of Title 3 of, the Education Code, and to amend Section 12419.5 of the Government Code, relating to student debts.
Title
Protecting Students from Creditor Colleges Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1160 Pacheco Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1160 Pacheco Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2024-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 8. Page 3949.) |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 18). |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-01-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-01-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (January 9). |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1788.91 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.92 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.93 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66035 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12419.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |