CA AB1151 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 441, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 441, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7513.7 of the Government Code, relating to investments.
Title
Public retirement systems: investments: Iran.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Asm. Mike Feuer [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] |
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-06 - Assembly - AB 1151 FEUER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1151 Feuer By Anderson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1151 FEUER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Employees, Retirement and Social Security (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1151 Feuer By Anderson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1151 FEUER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Employees, Retirement and Social Security (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 441, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-06 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2921.). | |
2011-09-01 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2192.). | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-21 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD. | |
2011-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1662.) | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-09 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-05 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-11 | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and P.E., R. & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2011-03-30 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Coms. on P.E., R. & S.S. and JUD. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7513.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |