CA AB1146 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-03 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-03 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56100.1, 82036.5, 83124, 84101, 84103, 84108, 84202.3, 84202.7, 84203.3, 84203.5, 84204.5, 84211, 84216, 84216.5, 84300, 84304, 84308, 84602, 84604, 84605, 84609, 85304, 85306, 85310, 85315, 85316, 85501, 89510, 89511.5, and 89512.5 of, to repeal Sections 84200.6, 84202.5, 84203, 84205, 84209, 84220, 85301, 85302, 85303, 85305, 85307, 85309, 85314, and 85321 of, to repeal Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 84250) of Chapter 4 of Title 9 of, and to repeal and add Section 84200 of, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Norby [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-07-03 - Senate - Reconsideration granted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1146 NORBY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1146 NORBY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-03 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-06-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2012-06-25 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2012-06-21 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-09-08 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wright. | |
2011-06-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 21). | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2011-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 16. Page 1750.) | |
2011-05-05 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-04-12 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |