CA AB1145 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 792, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 792, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 700, 5896.2, 5896.5, 5896.9, 5896.10, and 5896.14 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to electric and communication facilities.
Title
Conversion of existing overhead electric and communication facilities to underground locations: cable television corporations and cable operators.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Assembly - AB 1145 QUIRK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB1145 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1145 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB1145 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1145 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 792, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2928.). |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2349.). |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2017-07-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and GOV. & F. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1713.) |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17). |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and L. GOV. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 7010 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5896.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5896.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5896.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5896.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5896.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5896.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |