CA AB1140 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1530.91 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 16164 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foster care: rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1140 RIVAS, R. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1140 Robert Rivas By Durazo (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - AB 1140 Robert Rivas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-24 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-22 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2021-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
2021-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2021-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-09-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-07SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-09-07SenateJoint Rule 61 suspended.
2021-09-07SenatePursuant to JR 33.1
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-31SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-16SenateOrdered to third reading.
2021-08-16SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2021-07-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2021-06-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
2021-04-19SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-04-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1071.)
2021-04-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13).
2021-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1530.91Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16164Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback