CA AB114 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 413, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 413, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8280, 8280.1, 8286, 41207.47, 45500, 51226.7, 56213, 56836.08, 56836.40, 69617, 69996.2, 69996.3, and 69996.6 of the Education Code, to amend Section 102430 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 84 of Chapter 51 of the Statutes of 2019, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Education finance: education omnibus budget trailer bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 114 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB114 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 114 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB114 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 114 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 413, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3466.). |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3466.) |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 2901.). |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 10). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2690.) |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-08-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1184.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 41207.47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51226.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 56213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 56836.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 56836.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69617 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69996.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69996.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69996.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8280 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8280.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8286 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 102430 | Amended Code | Citation Text |