CA AB114 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 38, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 38, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1627, 1630, 102247, 103605, 103625, and 127662 of, to add Section 1629.5 to, and to repeal and add Section 127665 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 5892 and 5899 of, and to add Sections 5892.1 and 5899.1 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Assembly - AB 114 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB114 Ting By Mitchell (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 114 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB114 Ting By Mitchell (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 114 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 38, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2344.). |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on June 12 corrected. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1679.). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 13). |
2017-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1600.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1511.) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 102247 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 103605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 103625 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127662 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1627 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1629.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1630 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5892 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5892.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5899 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5899.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |