CA AB1139 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 148, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1098.5 of the Civil Code, relating to real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real property: transfer fees: notices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-17 - Assembly - AB 1139 REYES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB1139 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Assembly - AB 1139 REYES Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 148, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-31 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-21AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-07-17AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2564.).
2017-06-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-06-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1712.).
2017-06-20SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-06-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6).
2017-05-24SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 876.)
2017-03-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 28).
2017-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1098Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1098.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback