CA AB1130 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 750, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 750, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1798.29, 1798.81.5, and 1798.82 of the Civil Code, relating to information privacy.
Title
Personal information: data breaches.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1130 Levine By Wieckowski (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1130 Levine Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Asm Ap (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1130 Levine Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Asm Ap (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 750, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2560.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 19. Page 2091.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.81.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |