CA AB113 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17053.90 and 23690 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credits: electric vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 17. |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.90 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23690 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |