CA AB113 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 15438.11 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1276.5, 1276.65, 1341.45, 1348.9, 100235, 101315, 101315.2, 101317, 101317.2, 104151, 120955, 120956, 120970, and 121025 of, to amend the heading of Article 6 (commencing with Section 101315) of Chapter 3 of Part 3 of Division 101 of, to add Chapter 6.1 (commencing with Section 120972) to Part 4 of Division 105 of, and to add and repeal Chapter 1.6 (commencing with Section 103870) of Part 2 of Division 102 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 14005.30, 14105.45, 14105.456, 14124.70, 14124.71, 14124.72, 14124.73, 14124.74, 14124.785, 14124.82, 14124.83, 14126.022, 14131.10, 14132.99, 14132.100, 14132.276, 14132.277, 14148.8, 14154, 14166.61, 14182.16, 14182.17, 14182.18, 14186, 14186.1, 14186.2, 14186.3, 14186.4, 14301.2, 15893, and 15894 of, to amend and repeal Sections 12302.6, 14132.24, 14183.6, 14186.35, 14301.1, and 14593 of, to add Sections 14043.1, 14105.29, 14124.13, and 14132.991 to, to add Article 4.11 (commencing with Section 14149.9) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of, to add and repeal Section 14042.1 of, to repeal Sections 12330, 14124.80, 14124.85, 14124.88, 14148.65, 14148.67, 14186.11, 14186.36, 15893.5, and 15895.5 of, to repeal and amend Section 14132.275 of, and to repeal and add Sections 14102, 14124.81, and 14124.86 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, to repeal Section 166 of Chapter 717 of the Statutes of 2010, and to amend and repeal Section 34 of Chapter 37 of the Statutes of 2013, relating to health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 113 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 113 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 20). |
2017-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1599.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1511.) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |