CA AB1127 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 15805 and 50535 to the Government Code, and to add Section 118506 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public accommodations.
Title
Baby diaper changing stations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 1127 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1127 Calderon et al. By Lara (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - colspan="5" headers="noes 05/31/17" class="columnField" style="text-align:left"> (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1127 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1127 Calderon et al. By Lara (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - colspan="5" headers="noes 05/31/17" class="columnField" style="text-align:left"> (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1127 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3524.). |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 2897.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 6. Page 1916.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15805 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 50535 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 114276 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 118506 | New Code | See Bill Text |