CA AB1127 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 103628.7 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add and repeal Section 18309.1 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to domestic violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic and family violence: Sacramento County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1127 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom Senate committee without further action.
2015-05-28SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
2015-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 1483.)
2015-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 12).
2015-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-04-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-04-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2015-04-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-19AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and JUD.
2015-03-02AssemblyRead first time.
2015-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2015-02-27AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback