CA AB1127 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 115, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2234 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to medicine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physicians and surgeons: unprofessional conduct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1127 Brownley By Emmerson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1127 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 115, Statutes of 2011.
2011-07-25 Approved by the Governor.
2011-07-11 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
2011-07-05 In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2011-07-05 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1712.).
2011-06-28 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-06-27 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2011-06-07 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-05-26 Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2011-05-12 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2011-05-12 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 1345.)
2011-05-09 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-05 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
2011-04-12 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-04-05 Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
2011-04-04 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2011-03-17 Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
2011-02-20 From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2011-02-18 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2234Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1127&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_bill_20110218_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_bill_20110404_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_bill_20110706_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_bill_20110725_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_vote_20110412_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_vote_20110504_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_vote_20110512_1106AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_vote_20110606_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1101-1150/ab_1127_vote_20110705_1226PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback