CA AB1124 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14105.22 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Medi-Cal: reimbursement rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Assembly - AB 1124 MURATSUCHI Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1124 Muratsuchi Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1124 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1124 Muratsuchi Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1124 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-03-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4144.). |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 17). |
2014-03-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. by unanimous consent. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 10). |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4028.) |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2858.). |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (February 24). |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 12). |
2014-01-29 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1816.) |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and V.A. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14105.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14124.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |