CA AB1123 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8567, 8571, 8625, 8626, 8627.5, 8654, and 8685.4 of, and to add Sections 8588.4 and 8645.5 to, the Government Code, relating to emergency services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State of emergency: Governor’s powers: notice of executive action: audit of emergency fund expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Rodriguez. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Action rescinded and record expunged whereby a roll call vote was taken. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.M. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8567 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8571 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8588.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8625 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8626 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8627.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8645.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8654 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8685.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |