CA AB1122 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 44320.6 to the Education Code, relating to teachers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers: best practice guidance: dual-language and multilanguage educational programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1122 LIMÓN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1122 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1122 LIMÓN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-09 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2827.).
2017-07-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-07-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2129.).
2017-07-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-07-17SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-06SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-05SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5).
2017-06-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-05-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17).
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code44320.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback