CA AB1113 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 86, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 86, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 99243, 99312, 99312.1, 99312.7, 99313, 99313.1, 99313.3, 99313.6, 99313.7, 99314, 99314.1, 99314.2, 99314.3, 99314.4, 99314.5, 99314.6, and 99314.8 of, and to repeal and add Section 99312.2 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to public transit, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State Transit Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - Assembly - AB 1113 BLOOM Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1113 Bloom Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1113 BLOOM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1113 Bloom Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1113 BLOOM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 86, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2468.). |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1843.). |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1393.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 99243 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99312 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99312.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99312.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99312.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99313 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99313.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99313.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99313.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99313.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99314 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99314.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99314.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99314.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99314.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99314.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99314.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99314.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |