CA AB1111 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 824, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 14030) to Chapter 3 of Division 7 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to workforce development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing Barriers to Employment Act: Breaking Barriers to Employment Initiative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 1111 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1111 Eduardo Garcia By Bradford (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1111 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 824, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3502.).
2017-09-14AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 14).
2017-09-14AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3371.)
2017-09-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-09-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2855.).
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2017-06-22SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1835.)
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-05-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-03AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2017-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code180New CodeSee Bill Text
Unemployment Insurance Code14030New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback