CA AB111 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 65075 to the Government Code, to amend Section 25229 of the Public Resources Code, to add Sections 457 and 9623 to the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 2192 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation: zero-emission vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time.
2020-12-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 17.
2020-12-17AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65075New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code25229Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code457New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code9623New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code2192Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback