CA AB111 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17267, 17300, 17301, 17319, 81133, and 81133.1 of the Education Code, to amend Section 17202 of the Family Code, to amend Sections 905.2, 3515.7, 14659.10, 16304, 16304.1, 30035.5, and 99010 of, to add Sections 210.6, 1044, 8880.43, and 16401.5 to, to add Chapter 13 (commencing with Section 14985) to Part 5.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, and to repeal Chapter 3.7 (commencing with Section 8299) of Division 1 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 50676 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 11105 of the Penal Code, to amend Section 10187.5 of the Public Contract Code, to add Section 18874 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Section 1973 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, to repeal Section 15 of Chapter 6 of the Statutes of 2017, and to repeal Section 9 of Chapter 7 of the Statutes of 2017, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - AB 111 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB111 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 111 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB111 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 111 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 2219.). |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 2213.) |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 1561.). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (June 13). |
2017-06-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1598.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1511.) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |