CA AB111 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3273 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 4061 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 905.2, 4467, 4470, 8600, 11011.1, 12432, 13400, 13401, 13402, 13403, 13404, 13405, 13406, 13407, 13974.1, 16522, 16551, 16552, 16553, 16554, 16626, 16627, 16628, 16629, and 27397 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 13400) of Part 3 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to add Sections 8619.5, 17604, 19213, 21231, 21232, 65050, and 65051 to, and to add Article 3.9 (commencing with Section 8574.30) and Article 5.9 (commencing with Section 8590.6) to Chapter 7 of Division 1 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 50661 and 50716 of, and to add and repeal Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 34090) of Part 1.6 of Division 24 of, the Health and Safety Code, to add Sections 10089.395 and 10089.397 to the Insurance Code, to amend Sections 6309 and 7314 of the Labor Code, to amend Section 10340 of the Public Contract Code, and to amend Sections 10878, 41030, 41032, 42010, and 42023 of, and to add Sections 17138.3, 24308.7, 42010.7, 42023.5, 42101.7, and 42104 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 111 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateDied on Senate inactive file.
2015-09-11SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
2015-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (June 18). Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 1486.) Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-16SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2015-06-11SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-03-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2015-03-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 639.)
2015-03-19AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-01-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2015-01-12AssemblyRead first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
2015-01-09AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code3273Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code4061Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11011.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12432Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13400Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13401Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13402Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13403Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13404Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13405Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13406Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13407Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13974.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16522Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16551Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16552Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16553Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16554Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16626Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16627Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16628Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16629Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code17604New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code19213New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code21231New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code21232New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code27397Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code4467Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code4470Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65050New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65051New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8600Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8619.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code905.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34090Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50661Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50716Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10089.395New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code10089.397New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code6309Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code7314Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code10340Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code10878Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17138.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code24308.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41030Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41032Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code42010Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code42010.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code42023Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code42023.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code42101.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code42104New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback