CA AB111 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2014-02-03 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2012 (Chapters 21 and 29 of the Statutes of 2012) by amending Items 4140-001-3085, 4140-101-3085, 4140-490, 4300-003-0001, 4300-101-0001, and 5180-111-0001 of, and by adding Item 0250-491 to, Section 2.00 of, and by amending Section 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2012.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03AssemblyDied on inactive file.
2013-09-11AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Atkins.
2013-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 7.) (May 9).
2013-05-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2013-05-07AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
2013-05-02AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2013-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2013-01-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
2013-01-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback