CA AB111 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 15820.903, 15820.913, and 15820.917 of, and to repeal Section 15820.918 of, the Government Code, relating to criminal justice realignment, making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Criminal justice realignment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - Assembly - AB 111 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB111 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By Leno (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB111 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) Urgency Clause (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Assembly - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB111 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) By Leno (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB111 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) Urgency Clause (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Assembly - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-04-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-03-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2011-03-18 | Measure version as amended on March 17 corrected. | |
2011-03-17 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 615.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 616.). | |
2011-03-17 | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 371.) Amended pursuant to Joint Rule 23.5. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 372.). | |
2011-03-16 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (March 16). Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-15 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-14 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-03-07 | Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-02-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-02-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 0. Page 420.) | |
2011-02-18 | Without reference to committee. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-01-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | |
2011-01-10 | Read first time. To print. |