CA AB111 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17144.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Taxation: cancellation of indebtedness: mortgage debt
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-19 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2009-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2009-04-13 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-01 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2009-03-31 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-09 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2009-03-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2009-01-14 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. | |
2009-01-13 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17144.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |