CA AB1103 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21200 of, and to add and repeal Section 21200.1 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to bicycles.
Title
Bicycles: yielding: pilot program.
Sponsors
Asm. Jay Obernolte [R] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] |
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21200.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1103 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1103 |