CA AB1102 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 275, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1278.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health facilities: whistleblower protections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1102 Rodriguez By Jackson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1102 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 275, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-25 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2332.).
2017-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-07-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2017-05-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1718.)
2017-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-09AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1278.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback