CA AB1102 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 30607.8 to the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources.
Title
Beach fire rings: coastal development permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources and Water (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1102 ALLEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources and Water (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1102 ALLEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 4). |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and N.R. & W. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3686.) |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 13). |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38562 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38572 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 40440.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 40440.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 30607.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |