CA AB110 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 80, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2019 (Chapters 23 and 55 of the Statutes of 2019) by amending Item 8860-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of, and amending Section 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-11 - Assembly - AB 110 TING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB110 Ting By Mitchell (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 110 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 80, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-07-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2019-07-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2623.).
2019-07-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 2619.)
2019-07-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 2619.)
2019-07-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-07-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 2051.).
2019-07-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (July 10).
2019-07-08SenateJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1988.)
2019-07-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-07-08SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-07-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-04-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1182.)
2019-04-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-04-04AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.)
2019-01-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback